Senate | 06/10/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1890.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 1). | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 995.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |