Senate | 09/08/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 09/08/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/02/2015 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2429.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2015 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2620.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2015 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 950.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |