Senate
|
02/01/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3511.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1755.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
Set for hearing June 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1477.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Set for hearing June 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|