Senate | 07/22/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 07/22/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1982.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/13/2015 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2325.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1075.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |