Senate | 07/14/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 07/14/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2015 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1871.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2015 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2233.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1187.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |