Senate | 07/16/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/13/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2361.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/08/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8). | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2015 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2015 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1075.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |