Senate | 07/06/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 91, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 07/06/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2015 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1753.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2015 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2015 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2174.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23). | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2015 | April 21 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 148.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected January 16). |