Senate | 06/23/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2039.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1075.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |