Senate | 06/23/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2039.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 15). | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1117.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |