California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR65 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/26/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 65CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 143 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 26, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 18, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 20, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 10, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Cannella MAY 22, 2015 Relative to June Dairy Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 65, Cannella. June Dairy Month. This measure would proclaim the month of June to be Dairy Month in California, in honor of the work of dairy producers in California, and would encourage all Californians to continue to support the American dairy industry by including dairy products as part of a healthy diet. WHEREAS, The national "June Dairy Month," originally known as National Milk Month, has been an annual tradition since 1937, and is a great opportunity for Americans to honor dairy farmers and to recognize the importance of dairy products to a healthy diet for many Americans; and WHEREAS, California is the nation's number one milk-producing state, the number two cheese-producing state, and dairy is the state' s number one agricultural commodity; and WHEREAS, The landscape, economy, health, and nutrition of California would not be the same without our dairy farms and the more than 1500 families who run them; and WHEREAS, Only 30 percent of Americans meet their recommended intake of calcium, and the United States Surgeon General's office predicts that by 2020, one-half of all Americans older than 50 years of age will be at risk for fractures as a result of osteoporosis and low bone density; and WHEREAS, Dairy foods provide essential nutrients, including 75 percent of the calcium naturally available in the food supply, as well as potassium, magnesium, and vitamin A, and milk is the number one source of calcium, potassium, phosphorus, and vitamin D in the American diet; and WHEREAS, Dairy foods also play a beneficial role in maintaining a healthy weight; and WHEREAS, Dairy foods, when consumed as part of a healthy diet, may help to reduce osteoporosis, hypertension, obesity, colon cancer, and metabolic syndrome, a cluster of conditions that can also lead to heart disease and type II diabetes; and WHEREAS, Dairy farming is a leading agricultural commodity in California, producing $7.6 billion in annual retail sales in 2013; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the California Legislature hereby proclaims the month of June to be Dairy Month in California, in honor of the work of dairy producers in California, and encourages all Californians to continue to support the American dairy industry by including dairy products as part of a healthy diet; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.