Senate | 08/26/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2015 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2015 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2015 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2015 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2174.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1351.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |