California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR72 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/14/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 72CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 104 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 14, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 29, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 9, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 15, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Gaines (Coauthors: Senators Bates, Glazer, Hertzberg, Huff, Pavley, and Vidak) JUNE 1, 2015 Relative to Teacher Appreciation Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 72, Gaines. Teacher Appreciation Month. This measure would designate the month of May 2015 as Teacher Appreciation Month, recognize teachers for the significant role they play, and encourage pupils, parents, and public officials to publicly recognize the hard work and dedication of teachers, and to observe the month by supporting teachers through appropriate activities, events, and programs. WHEREAS, Talented and hardworking teachers throughout California's public, private, and charter schools are nurturing the next generation of thinkers, doers, and dreamers; and WHEREAS, Teachers teach the skills that will inspire the next century of professionals, entrepreneurs, innovators, and workers in critically needed technical careers and professions; and WHEREAS, Teachers also build character, compassion, creativity, and resilience among our state's children that will prepare them to take on the challenges of the future; and WHEREAS, Our best teachers are role models who show our kids how to work hard and pursue a brighter future, and who further encourage children's passions, inspire their imaginations, and help them realize the best versions of themselves; and WHEREAS, Teaching is an all-encompassing commitment, and teachers make enormous sacrifices to support their pupils; and WHEREAS, We can improve our country's educational system significantly by exhibiting respect for teachers, and by letting them know how much we value their contributions in helping schools meet the needs of pupils from all communities in our state; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature designates the month of May 2015 as Teacher Appreciation Month; and, be it further Resolved, That the Legislature recognizes teachers for the significant role they play in our lives and in the well-being of our state; and, be it further Resolved, That the Legislature encourages pupils, parents, and public officials to publicly recognize the hard work and dedication of teachers, and to observe the month by supporting teachers through appropriate activities, events, and programs; and, be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.