Senate | 08/26/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 140, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2534.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 17). | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1872.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2015 | From inactive file on motion of Senator Fuller. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Fuller. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |