Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | Died at Desk. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5546.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2016 | From inactive file on motion of Senator Allen. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 09/10/2015 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Runner. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 07/07/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |