Senate | 09/04/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:15 a.m. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2751.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 27). | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/13/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |