Senate | 09/08/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 09/08/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/02/2015 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2417.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2015 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2015 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2698.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 27). | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |