California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR84 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/08/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 84CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 164 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 8, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 24, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 2, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Jackson (Coauthor: Assembly Member Cristina Garcia) AUGUST 17, 2015 Relative to Women's Equality Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 84, Jackson. Women's Equality Day. This measure would recognize August 26, 2015, as Women's Equality Day and its historic importance to women's rights, including the battle to attain those rights in the past, present, and future. WHEREAS, The first women's rights convention on July 19, 1848, was called by Elizabeth Cady Stanton and Lucretia Mott to win equal rights for and expand the role of women in society, and it was then that the fight for women's rights came together as an organized effort; and WHEREAS, In 1851, abolitionist and women's rights activist Sojourner Truth delivered her renowned extemporaneous speech "Ain't I a Woman?" at the Ohio Women's Rights Convention in Akron; and WHEREAS, The addition of the Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution on August 26, 1920, secured for women the right to vote; and WHEREAS, The passage of the federal Civil Rights Act of 1964 barred employment discrimination against women; and WHEREAS, The enactment of Title IX of the federal Education Amendments of 1972 guaranteed equal opportunity for women in all aspects of education; and WHEREAS, Many women have planned, organized, lectured, written, marched, lobbied, canvassed voters, staged parades, become candidates for political office, argued court cases, and more, in order to irrevocably change for the better the world of today's women and girls; and WHEREAS, Despite the many efforts of policymakers and advocates, both women and men, toward ensuring equality for women, gender inequality persists in many areas, as evidenced by the ongoing struggle for fair pay and equal job opportunities, job training opportunities, access to child care, family friendly workplaces, and against poverty, especially among women and children; and WHEREAS, Despite important steps to achieve equal access in the workplace and to educational opportunities, women face barriers in education and employment that are not experienced at the same magnitude by men, including, the presence of historical male privilege and gender bias; sex discrimination, harassment, and sexual violence in the workplace and on campus; the complications of having caregiving duties in the unpaid economy; and being undervalued for their work in the paid economy; and WHEREAS, Women are critical to a strong and vibrant California economy and play a pivotal role in spurring economic growth in California; and WHEREAS, Women comprise almost one-half of the workforce in our state and are primary income earners in many households; and WHEREAS, The lack of affordable, quality child care and affordable housing makes it hard for women to provide safe and secure environments for their families; and WHEREAS, Women's earnings are still far too low compared to men's in California, and women are disproportionately employed in jobs that pay the minimum wage; and WHEREAS, Women are also disproportionately disadvantaged by the stresses of poverty and the constraints of the social services system; and WHEREAS, Ensuring the economic security of all California women and their families will benefit all communities, including men, children, and families who count on public policies to meet their basic needs, earn a decent living, and care for their families; and WHEREAS, The women of the United States have designated August 26 as a symbol of the continued fight for equal rights; and WHEREAS, The United States Congress recognizes that August 26 of each year is designated as Women's Equality Day and the President of the United States annually issues a proclamation commemorating August 26, 1920, as the day when the women of the United States were first given the right to vote and recognizes that same date in 1970 when a nationwide demonstration for women's rights took place; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That upon the anniversary of the Nineteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution, the Legislature recognizes August 26, 2015, as Women's Equality Day and its historic importance to women's rights, including the battle to attain those rights in the past, present, and future; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.