California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR86 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/24/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 86CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 136 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 24, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Pan (Principal coauthor: Senator Nguyen) (Coauthor: Assembly Member McCarty) AUGUST 20, 2015 Relative to Little Saigon. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 86, Pan. Little Saigon. This measure would recognize California's Vietnamese Americans and "Little Saigon" communities. WHEREAS, There are at least four areas in California that have been officially designated as "Little Saigon"; and WHEREAS, The oldest, largest, and most prominent "Little Saigon" is located in Orange County with over 189,000 Vietnamese American residents; and WHEREAS, The "Little Saigon" in San Jose is comparable to the "Little Saigon" in Orange County with over 180,000 Vietnamese American residents; and WHEREAS, In February 2010, Sacramento officially named a stretch of Stockton Boulevard, from Florin Road to Fruitridge Road, "Little Saigon" due to the growing and thriving Vietnamese American population; and WHEREAS, San Francisco designated Larkin Street, between Eddy and O'Farrell Streets, "Little Saigon," where more than three-quarters of the businesses on the two-block stretch are owned by Vietnamese Americans; and WHEREAS, Oakland, San Diego, and communities in the San Gabriel Valley are seeing a large increase in their Vietnamese American residents; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes the positive contributions of Vietnamese Americans and "Little Saigon" communities to California's diverse population and economy; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature encourages the growth of these cultural and economic hubs that have been established through a rise in the Vietnamese American population and "Little Saigon" communities; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.