Senate | 08/30/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5427.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2016 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5926.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 11). | ||
Assembly | 08/10/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2363.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |