Senate | 02/01/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2976.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2016 | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Holden. Ordered to third reading. Read. Amended. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. (Corrected January 27). | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 15). | ||
Assembly | 09/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2276.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |