Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 09/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/02/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 09/02/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2428.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |