Senate | 02/24/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 342.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 17). | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 125.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected January 14). |