Senate | 02/01/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2960.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2016 | Read. Amended. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 21). | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2905.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |