Senate | 05/04/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4597.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3068.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |