Senate | 08/26/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 146, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6060.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 18). | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4866.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | From inactive file on motion of Senator Pan. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2016 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Pan. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |