Senate | 08/17/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 08/16/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4878.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/03/2016 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5581.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11). | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3219.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |