Senate | 07/06/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 07/06/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 66. Noes 10. Page 2232.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2015 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 633.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 594.) (April 13). | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 12/01/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |