Senate
|
09/18/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 182, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:15 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2762.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3100.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (September 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1640.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
Set for hearing June 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
June 17 hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Set for hearing June 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|