Senate | 09/18/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 09/18/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:15 a.m. (Corrected September 16). | ||
Senate | 09/11/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 3178.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2015 | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 11). | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2015 | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2015 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 07/16/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1985.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 07/14/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/13/2015 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2015 | Set for hearing July 13. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2015 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4. Page 1704.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2015 | Set for hearing June 29. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |