Senate | 08/28/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2639.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 25). | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1754.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected June 4). |