Senate | 09/04/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 160, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:15 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 57. Noes 11. Page 2697.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/15/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 15). | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2015 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1548.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1475.) (June 16). | ||
Senate | 06/12/2015 | Set for hearing June 16. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |