Senate | 09/08/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 09/08/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/03/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2847.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 27). | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2015 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 07/16/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1984.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 07/13/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |