Senate | 07/07/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 82, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 07/07/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 49. Noes 19. Page 5572.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21). | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 3428.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3396.) (April 5). | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |