Senate | 06/30/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9 a.m. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5487.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 15). | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2016 | June 8 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3709.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3594.) (April 19). | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |