Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | Died on the inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2016 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 23). | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4883.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/08/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/03/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |