Senate | 09/09/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 190, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 31). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 58. Noes 8. Page 6547.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 5412.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |