Senate | 07/01/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2179.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 23). | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2015 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 772.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |