BILL NUMBER: SJR 9CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 181 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 18, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 11, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 10, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 10, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 29, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Stone (Coauthors: Senators Bates, Fuller, Huff, Morrell, Nguyen, Runner, and Vidak) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Travis Allen, Atkins, Baker, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonilla, Bonta, Brown, Burke, Calderon, Campos, Chang, Chau, Chvez, Chiu, Chu, Cooper, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Dodd, Eggman, Frazier, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Gonzalez, Gordon, Hadley, Jones, Jones-Sawyer, Kim, Lackey, Levine, Linder, Lopez, Low, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Olsen, Perea, Quirk, Rendon, Rodriguez, Salas, Santiago, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Wagner, Waldron, Weber, Wilk, Williams, and Wood) MAY 22, 2015 Relative to the Chronic Kidney Disease Improvement in Research and Treatment Act of 2015. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SJR 9, Stone. The Chronic Kidney Disease Improvement in Research and Treatment Act of 2015. This measure would urge the President and the Congress of the United States to enact the Chronic Kidney Disease Improvement in Research and Treatment Act of 2015. WHEREAS, Approximately 50 years ago, kidney failure was a death sentence; and WHEREAS, In 1972, Congress developed the Medicare End-Stage Renal Disease benefit. In doing so, Congress ensured that regardless of age or income, any American would have access to lifesaving dialysis care. That was the turning point in kidney care; and WHEREAS, The Chronic Kidney Disease Improvement in Research and Treatment Act of 2015 (HR 1130) was introduced in the House of Representatives by Representative Tom Marino to address kidney disease care; and WHEREAS, House Resolution 1130 is built on three primary tenets. First, for individuals living with chronic diseases, especially when those diseases are complicated by multiple comorbid conditions, coordinated care is key to improving outcomes and lowering health care costs. Second, increased research can lead to a deeper understanding of kidney disease prevention and ultimately to significant innovations in treatment. Lastly, stability in the Medicare Program is central to an end-stage renal disease program that ensures quality and produces optimal results; and WHEREAS, If left untreated, chronic kidney disease can progress to kidney failure, also known as end-stage renal disease, and early cardiovascular death; and WHEREAS, More than 20 million adults in the United States, or more than 10 percent of the adult population, are estimated to have chronic kidney disease and most are undiagnosed; and WHEREAS, Kidney disease is the ninth leading cause of death in the United States; and WHEREAS, In the United States, diabetes and high blood pressure are the leading causes of kidney failure, accounting for 72 percent or about three out of four new cases of kidney failure; and WHEREAS, The number of kidney failure cases in the United States population has more than tripled since 1990 and is expected to grow because of an aging population and the increasing number of people with conditions, such as diabetes and high blood pressure, that place them at the risk of developing chronic kidney disease; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate and the Assembly of the State of California, jointly, That the Legislature urges the President and the Congress of the United States to enact the Chronic Kidney Disease Improvement in Research and Treatment Act of 2015 (HR 1130); and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the President of the United States, to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States, and to the author for appropriate distribution.