LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR32
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR32
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR32
Action History
Senate
11/30/2016
Died on the inactive file.
Senate
06/18/2015
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Morrell.
Senate
06/17/2015
Ordered to special consent calendar.
Senate
05/28/2015
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Senate
05/21/2015
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.