California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR78 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 06/06/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SR 78INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Huff JUNE 6, 2016 Relative to the 151st anniversary of Juneteenth. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST HOUSE OR SENATE RESOLUTIONS DO NOT CONTAIN A DIGEST WHEREAS, June 19, 2016, marks the 151st anniversary of Juneteenth ; and WHEREAS, Juneteenth, also known as "Juneteenth Independence Day," "Emancipation Day," "Emancipation Celebration," and "Freedom Day," is the oldest African American holiday observance in the United States; and WHEREAS, Juneteenth commemorates the strong survival instinct of African Americans who were first brought to this country stacked in the bottom of slave ships in a month-long journey across the Atlantic Ocean known as the "Middle Passage"; and WHEREAS, Events in the history of the United States that led to the start of the Civil War in 1861 centered on sectional differences between the North and the South that were based on the economic and social divergence caused by the existence of slavery; and WHEREAS, In 1862, the first clear signs that the end of slavery was imminent appeared when laws abolishing slavery were adopted in the territories of Oklahoma, Nebraska, Colorado, and New Mexico; and WHEREAS, In September 1862, President Lincoln issued the celebrated Emancipation Proclamation, warning the rebellious Confederate states that he would declare their slaves "forever free" if those states did not return to the Union by January 1, 1863; and WHEREAS, Enforcement of the Emancipation Proclamation occurred only in Confederate states that were under Union Army control; and WHEREAS, On January 31, 1865, Congress passed the Thirteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution abolishing slavery throughout the United States and its territories; and WHEREAS, Spontaneous celebration erupted throughout the country when African Americans learned of their freedom; and WHEREAS, Juneteenth, or June 19, 1865, is considered the date upon which the last slaves in America were freed when General Gordon Granger rode into Galveston, Texas, and issued General Order No. 3, almost two and one-half years after President Lincoln issued the Emancipation Proclamation; and WHEREAS, Observance of Juneteenth, a reminder of emancipation, spread from Texas to the neighboring states of Louisiana, Arkansas, and Oklahoma, as well as Alabama, Florida, and California where many African American Texans migrated; and WHEREAS, Juneteenth symbolizes freedom, celebrates the abolishment of slavery, and reminds all Americans of the significant contributions of African Americans to our society; and WHEREAS, A growing number of American and African American cultural institutions have sponsored Juneteenth cultural events designed to make all Americans aware of this celebration; and WHEREAS, Juneteenth celebrations are a tribute to those African Americans who fought so long and worked so hard to make the dream of equality a reality; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That June 19, 2016, is hereby recognized, as the 151st anniversary of Juneteenth; and be it further Resolved, That the Senate urges the people of California to join in celebrating Juneteenth as a day to honor and reflect on the significant role that African Americans have played in the history of the United States and how they have enriched society through their steadfast commitment to promoting unity and equality; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.