California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR80 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/24/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SR 80ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 23, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 21, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 21, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senators Pavley and Allen JUNE 9, 2016 Relative to the Santa Monica Mountains Backbone Trail LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST HOUSE OR SENATE RESOLUTIONS DO NOT CONTAIN A DIGEST WHEREAS, On June 4, 2016, the Backbone Trail, a spectacular 67-mile route among the canyons and mountains of the Santa Monica Mountains, officially opened; and WHEREAS, The Backbone Trail began as a dream in 1944 with the establishment of Will Rogers State Historic Park, which is now the eastern end of the Backbone Trail. Over the decades, the Department of Parks and Recreation established Topanga State Park, Malibu Creek State Park, and Point Mugu State Park; and WHEREAS, In 1978, the United States Congress established the Santa Monica Mountain National Recreation Area to be managed by the National Park Service in partnership with state and local governments. Additionally, the Santa Monica Mountains Conservancy, the Mountain Recreation and Conservation Authority, and the National Park Service acquired numerous properties for the Backbone Trail; and WHEREAS, An essential contribution to the trail came from volunteers whose work began long before the trail was pieced together by public agencies and whose volunteer contributions are an unsung success story that made it possible for the trail to open to the public this year; and WHEREAS, Financial grants from local governments, such as the City of Los Angeles, and property grants from private donors, including a donation of one of the final parcels by former California Governor Arnold Schwarzenegger and fitness pioneer Betty Weider, completed the acquisitions necessary to complete the trail; and WHEREAS, Trails and greenways have a beneficial impact on the quality of life in California, including the environment, economy, health, education, and community livability; and WHEREAS, The recognition and completion of the Backbone Trail, which has been designated as an official California trail corridor in the California State Recreation Trails Plan, and which the National Park Service designated as a National Recreation Trail, is an integral part of government's responsibility to provide public access to parklands; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes the California Department of Parks and Recreation for its contribution of integral parts of the Backbone Trail in the Santa Monica Mountains, declares the Backbone Trail an official interagency and state trail, and urges all affected public agencies to work collaboratively on the successful management of the trail for the perpetual use and enjoyment of the public; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.