California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR82 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/12/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SR 82ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 11, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 30, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Huff JUNE 30, 2016 Relative to Latex Allergy Awareness Week LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST HOUSE OR SENATE RESOLUTIONS DO NOT CONTAIN A DIGEST WHEREAS, Latex allergy patients face a constant threat to their lives from exposure to rubber latex allergens; reactions can be elicited by touching a product containing natural rubber latex, breathing airborne latex proteins, or digesting food prepared using latex gloves; and WHEREAS, The incidence of latex allergies has increased due to widespread exposure to products containing latex; and WHEREAS, Up to 6 percent of people in the United States are estimated to have latex allergies, including up to 17 percent of health care and food service workers, 11 percent of elderly, and up to 68 percent of children with spina bifida; and WHEREAS, Exposure to natural rubber latex results in up to 10 deaths per year in the community of latex allergy patients and is the second most common cause of anaphylaxis in the operating room; and WHEREAS, Some patients with a latex allergy may also experience allergic symptoms when eating certain fruits, vegetables, and nuts, including, among other things, banana, avocado, kiwi, tomato, carrot, and chestnut; and WHEREAS, There is no cure for a latex allergy, and every exposure increases the sensitivity and severity of the patient's condition, with distress and rebound reactions for days after exposure; and WHEREAS, Latex allergies can only be prevented by avoiding all latex-related products, which can be found at homes, child care centers, stores, schools, workplaces, and health care environments, among other places; and WHEREAS, Natural rubber is found in over 40,000 products, including, but not limited to, hair accessories, toys, balloons, school and office supplies, sports equipment, and medical devices, resulting in a daily struggle for latex allergy patients to balance life and work with staying safe and healthy; and WHEREAS, Latex allergies result in a growing number of workers' compensation claims arising from workplace exposure to products containing natural rubber latex; and WHEREAS, The American Latex Allergy Association creates awareness of latex allergies through education and provides support to individuals who have been diagnosed with a latex allergy; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby proclaims the week of October 2, 2016, through October 8, 2016, as Latex Allergy Awareness Week in California; and be it further Resolved, That the Senate encourages all Californians to be informed about the causes, symptoms, treatment, and prevention of latex allergies; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.