|
07/31/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 145, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/31/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/18/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2023.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1490.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|