Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
From Special Consent Calendar. Ordered to unfinished business file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2908.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 1646.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|