|
09/01/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 205, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2176.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1393.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|