Assembly | 05/24/2017 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2017 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2017 | Read first time. To print. |