Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 3857.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|