|
06/01/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4221.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3779.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|