|
09/27/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 803, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 6. Page 6641.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6480.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5452.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2018
|
From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 14)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1936.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|