|
07/24/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1932.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1620.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|